CT SB00267 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - File Number 712
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - File Number 712
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To implement several reforms concerning the integrity of statements signed by electors in lieu of presenting certain identification at the polls when voting in person.
Title
An Act Concerning Auditing Of Signed Statements Of Electors Prior To Voting.
Sponsors
House Government Administration and Elections Committee | Sen. Robert Sampson [R] | Rep. Anne Dauphinais [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Senate | File Number 712 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 329 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/25 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |