CT SB00266 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - File Number 711
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To establish polling places for use during elections on college and university campuses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Polling Places At Institutions Of Higher Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenateFile Number 711
2019-04-17SenateSenate Calendar Number 328
2019-04-17SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-17SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-11SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-01SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-11SenatePublic Hearing 02/15
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
2019-02-06SenateVote to Draft
2019-02-06SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-01-23SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback