CT SB00266 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To give a person who signs a resident admission agreement at a nursing home a right to rescind the agreement within three business days.
Title
An Act Concerning Nursing Home Resident Admission Agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 295 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 122 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 330 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 334 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 330 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 334 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Public Act 16-209 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2016-05-04 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2016-05-04 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-04 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-03 | Senate | House Calendar Number 578 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5473 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-21 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Public Health |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health |
2016-03-24 | Senate | File Number 216 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 169 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |