CT SB00266 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-29 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Veterans' Affairs
Pending: Joint Select Committee on Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-29 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Veterans' Affairs
Pending: Joint Select Committee on Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To prohibit municipalities from charging interest on delinquent property taxes due from members of the armed forces serving outside of the United States.
Title
An Act Concerning Property Tax Relief For Members Of The Armed Forces On Active Duty Outside Of The United States.
Sponsors
House Planning and Development Committee | Sen. Robert Kane [R] | Sen. Kevin Kelly [R] | Rep. Lonnie Reed [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Veterans' Affairs |
2014-04-22 | Senate | File Number 655 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 443 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/22/14 10:00 AM |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |