CT SB00251 | 2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To preserve consumer access to affordable generic drugs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Availability Of Generic Pharmaceuticals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2020-03-10SenateJoint Favorable
2020-02-27SenatePublic Hearing 03/03
2020-02-26SenateReferred to Joint Committee on General Law

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback