CT SB00248 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-02 - Matter Pass Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-02 - Matter Pass Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To increase the threshold for requiring contracts be awarded to the lowest responsible and qualified bidder from five hundred thousand dollars to one million five hundred thousand dollars, to require subcontractors to be prequalified at the time of bid submittal, to allow the construction manager at-risk to prepare the site prior to the completion of the guaranteed maximum price and to allow such price to be determined in phases, to permit the Department of Administrative Services to enter into on-call contracts with consultants for projects involving certain agencies and to permit the department to purchase property and services from persons holding a contract with the federal government or other state governments.
Title
An Act Concerning Public Works Projects And The Threshold For Competitive Bidding, Subcontractor Prequalification, Construction Manager At-risk Project Delivery Contracts, The Hiring Of Consultants And The Purchasing Of Certain Property And Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Matter Pass Retained |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule D 4214 |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule C 5111 |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 4644 |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4457 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | File Number 517 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 348 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/14 10:00 AM |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |