CT SB00246 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To prevent unnecessary costs and clinical outcomes associated with prescriptions that are unnecessarily automatically refilled.
Title
An Act Limiting Auto Refills Of Prescription Drugs Covered Under The Medicaid Program And Requiring The Commissioner Of Social Services To Provide Chip Data To The Health Information Technology Officer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 264 AS AMENDED (Y: 125 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 128 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 128 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Public Act 18-77 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2018-05-08 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-08 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-03 | Senate | House Calendar Number 491 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-05-01 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4345 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | File Number 159 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 124 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 10:00 AM |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |