CT SB00246 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-19 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Education
Pending: Joint Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-19 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Education
Pending: Joint Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To increase the penalties when a threat involves a preschool, school or an institution of higher education and to provide for an automatic pardon for certain persons who make such a threat prior to attaining the age of eighteen years.
Title
An Act Concerning The Zero-tolerance Safe School Environment Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Education |
2016-04-07 | Senate | File Number 548 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 351 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/02 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |