CT SB00241 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - File Number 382
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - File Number 382
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require entities authorized to participate in the federal 340B Drug Pricing Program to report to the Health Systems Planning Unit of the Office of Health Strategy certain information regarding the program, including (1) aggregated acquisition costs, (2) aggregated payment information, (3) the number of claims for prescription drugs under the program, and (4) if the entity is a hospital, the national drug code number for the fifty most frequently dispensed prescription drugs by the hospital under the program.
Title
An Act Concerning The Office Of Health Strategy's Recommendations Regarding 340b Program Transparency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-22 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Senate | File Number 382 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 244 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |