CT SB00241 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) require all vessels upon the waters of the state to contain labels that enable law enforcement to readily identify the owner of such vessel, (2) facilitate existing procedures for enforcement of boating laws, and (3) provide incentives, funding and staff for the increased and sustained enforcement of the boating safety laws of the state on the lakes, rivers and other waters of the state.
Title
An Act Concerning Boating Safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 241 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 153 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 153 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Public Act 22-144 |
2022-05-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2022-05-04 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-04 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-22 | Senate | House Calendar Number 445 |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4979 |
2022-04-13 | Senate | File Number 440 |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 306 |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |