CT SB00241 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To permit adjunct faculty members of the regional community-technical colleges to waive membership in a Connecticut retirement plan just as adjunct faculty members employed by the Connecticut State University System or The University of Connecticut are permitted to do.
Title
An Act Allowing Adjunct Faculty Members Of The Regional Community-technical College System To Waive Membership In A State Retirement Plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 229 AS AMENDED (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 121 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 121 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-05-18 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-05-11 | Public Act 12-52 | |
2012-05-04 | In Concurrence | |
2012-05-04 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-04 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-04-12 | House Calendar Number 327 | |
2012-04-12 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-11 | On Consent Calendar | |
2012-04-11 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-04-11 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3180 | |
2012-04-04 | File Number 264 | |
2012-04-04 | Senate Calendar Number 212 | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-04 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-29 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-20 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-03-20 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-14 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |
2012-03-14 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |
2012-03-14 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-13 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-13 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Labor and Public Employees | |
2012-03-02 | Public Hearing 03/08 | |
2012-02-23 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |