CT SB00239 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - File Number 308
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - File Number 308
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit the use of certain rodenticides in locations such as state parks and forests for the protection of hawks, raptors and other wildlife that feed upon such rodents.
Title
An Act Prohibiting The Use Of Certain Rodenticides For The Protection Of Hawks, Raptors And Other Wildlife.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | Senate | File Number 308 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 227 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |