CT SB00238 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-03 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-03 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To make clarifying, technical and conforming changes to provisions concerning the establishment, accumulation and disbursement of inmate discharge savings accounts that are payable to the inmate upon release from incarceration.
Title
An Act Concerning Inmate Discharge Savings Accounts.
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | Sen. Eric Coleman [D] | Sen. Toni Harp [D] | Sen. Anthony Musto [D] |
Sen. Stephen Cassano [D] | Rep. Joseph Serra [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - House - House Roll Call Vote 237 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 256 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 256 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-03 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Public Act 13-69 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2013-05-22 | Senate | House Passed |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-05-15 | Senate | House Calendar Number 567 |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-05-14 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2013-05-01 | Senate | File Number 649 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 480 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/30/13 5:00 PM |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/13 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |