CT SB00237 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - File Number 510
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - File Number 510
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a task force to evaluate time limitations for prosecuting a crime of sexual assault.
Title
An Act Establishing A Task Force To Evaluate Statutes Of Limitations For Sexual Assault Crimes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | Senate | File Number 510 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 314 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/18 10:00 AM |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/16 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |