CT SB00237 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To permit the Labor Department to share wage and employment data with institutions of higher education for purposes of program evaluation.
Title
An Act Concerning The Sharing Of Information Between The Labor Department And The Board Of Regents For Higher Education.
Sponsors
Rep. James Crawford [D] | Sen. Toni Harp [D] | House Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee | Rep. Lawrence Miller [R] |
Sen. Anthony Musto [D] | Rep. Joseph Serra [D] | Rep. Prasad Srinivasan [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 241 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-06-01 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-05-30 | Public Act 12-192 | |
2012-05-09 | In Concurrence | |
2012-05-09 | On Consent Calendar | |
2012-05-09 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-09 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-04 | House Calendar Number 500 | |
2012-05-04 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-05-02 | On Consent Calendar | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4137 | |
2012-04-03 | File Number 236 | |
2012-04-03 | Senate Calendar Number 205 | |
2012-04-03 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-03 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-27 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-20 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-03-20 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-09 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |
2012-03-09 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |
2012-03-09 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-07 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-06 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Labor and Public Employees | |
2012-02-24 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |
2012-02-23 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |