CT SB00236 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-01 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-01 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide payment to physicians who treat Medicaid recipients in emergency rooms but do not receive a salary or subsidy for those services.
Title
An Act Concerning Reimbursement Of Emergency Room Physicians For Treatment Of Medicaid Recipients.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-17 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-17 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-04-16 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-16 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-13 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-04-10 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-03-27 | File Number 121 | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Calendar Number 122 | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-03-27 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-21 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-16 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-13 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-02-24 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |
2012-02-23 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |