CT SB00234 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require (1) the construction of a firearms training facility to be located on previously purchased state-owned or leased property, and (2) the Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection to conduct a study regarding its firearms training needs.
Title
An Act Concerning The Location Of A Firearms Training Facility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-28 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-03-29 | Senate | File Number 266 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 202 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 10:00 AM |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |