CT SB00232 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To authorize the State Board of Education to issue a military spouse teacher permit to the spouse of any member of the armed forces who has been transferred to the state.
Title
An Act Concerning Teacher Permits For Spouses Of Transferred Members Of The Armed Forces.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 283 AS AMENDED (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 248 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 248 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-25 | House | Public Act 18-144 |
2018-05-09 | House | In Concurrence |
2018-05-09 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-09 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-08 | House | House Calendar Number 570 |
2018-05-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-05-07 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4671 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | File Number 158 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 123 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 10:00 AM |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |