CT SB00231 | 2016 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To implement state and private actions that are aimed at protecting pollinator populations through restrictions on the use of neonicotinoids and the increase and preservation of pollinator habitats.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Pollinator Health.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 128 AS AMENDED (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 172 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 176 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-06SenateSigned by the Governor
2016-05-03SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2016-05-02SenatePublic Act 16-17
2016-04-26SenateIn Concurrence
2016-04-26SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2016-04-26SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2016-04-22SenateHouse Calendar Number 482
2016-04-22SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2016-04-21SenateOn Consent Calendar
2016-04-21SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2016-04-21SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4281
2016-04-12SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2016-04-12SenateNo New File by Committee on Planning and Development
2016-04-12SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2016-04-12SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2016-04-11SenateJoint Favorable
2016-04-06SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
2016-03-31SenateFile Number 373
2016-03-31SenateSenate Calendar Number 260
2016-03-31SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2016-03-31SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2016-03-24SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/16 5:00 PM
2016-03-14SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2016-03-11SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2016-02-29SenatePublic Hearing 03/04
2016-02-24SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback