CT SB00226 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize dual landings of fish in the state.
Title
An Act Authorizing Dual Landings Of Fish In The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 315 (Y: 143 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 71 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 71 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Public Act 19-28 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2019-06-04 | Senate | House Passed |
2019-04-26 | Senate | House Calendar Number 502 |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-24 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2019-03-12 | Senate | File Number 45 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 46 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/11/19 5:00 PM |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/15 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |