CT SB00226 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To (1) eliminate the requirement that each organization of the state armed forces adopt bylaws for its government, and (2) direct the Governor to configure and administer military units of the state organized militia consistent with National Guard and federal military units.
Title
An Act Concerning Use Of Military Facilities By Youth Military Organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 302 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 206 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 206 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Public Act 18-143 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2018-05-09 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-09 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-09 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-06 | Senate | House Calendar Number 537 |
2018-05-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-05-04 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4859 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | File Number 47 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 66 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/18 10:00 AM |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |