CT SB00213 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-11 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-11 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish the Veterans' Opportunities pilot program to actively seek opportunities for veterans to enter the workplace.
Title
An Act Concerning The Veterans' Opportunities Pilot Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-11 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2014-03-27 | Senate | File Number 172 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 136 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |