CT SB00210 | 2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - House Calendar Number 459
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To amend the statutory definition of "surprise billing" to include certain laboratory services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Surprise Medical Bills For Laboratory Services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 99 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 101 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26SenateHouse Calendar Number 459
2018-04-26SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2018-04-25SenateOn Consent Calendar
2018-04-25SenateSenate Passed
2018-04-09SenateFile Number 330
2018-04-09SenateSenate Calendar Number 201
2018-04-09SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2018-04-09SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-04-02SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 10:00 AM
2018-03-21SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-20SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2018-02-23SenatePublic Hearing 03/01
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback