CT SB00210 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-5-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-5-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To prohibit the use of bisphenol-A in cash register receipt paper and require the Chemical Innovations Institute to annually develop a list of chemicals of high toxic concern.
Title
An Act Prohibiting The Use Of Bisphenol-a In Thermal Receipt Paper.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 345 AS AMENDED (Y: 109 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 344 LCO # 8714 (Y: 50 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2011-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 411 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 344 LCO # 8714 (Y: 50 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2011-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 411 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-30 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-28 | Public Act 11-222 | |
2011-06-08 | In Concurrence | |
2011-06-08 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-08 | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 8714 | |
2011-06-08 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-06 | House Calendar Number 627 | |
2011-06-06 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-06-06 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | |
2011-06-06 | On Consent Calendar | |
2011-06-06 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-06 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8298 | |
2011-04-28 | File Number 669 | |
2011-04-28 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-28 | New File by Committee on General Law | |
2011-04-28 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-21 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/27/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-04-21 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-20 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-04-14 | Referred by Senate to Committee on General Law | |
2011-04-04 | File Number 327 | |
2011-04-04 | Senate Calendar Number 214 | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-04 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-28 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/11 10:00 AM | |
2011-03-22 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-18 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-02-18 | Public Hearing 02/23 | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | |
2011-02-16 | Drafted by Committee | |
2011-01-28 | Vote to Draft | |
2011-01-19 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |