CT SB00205 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To continue building awareness of women veterans' issues and address their unique needs by expanding opportunities for outreach and support by the Department of Veterans' Affairs.
Title
An Act Concerning Women Veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 295 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 122 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 219 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 223 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 219 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 223 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Public Act 16-192 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2016-05-04 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2016-05-04 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-04 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-30 | Senate | House Calendar Number 523 |
2016-04-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-28 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4530 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | File Number 97 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 132 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/16 10:00 AM |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |