CT SB00201 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To expand the posthumous awarding of the service in time of war medal and ribbon to any veteran who died after World War I.
Title
An Act Concerning The Posthumous Awarding Of The Connecticut Wartime Service Medal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 295 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 122 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 97 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 101 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 97 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 101 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Public Act 16-164 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2016-05-04 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2016-05-04 | Senate | House Passed |
2016-04-14 | Senate | House Calendar Number 400 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-13 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2016-03-21 | Senate | File Number 93 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 128 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/16 10:00 AM |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |