CT SB00200 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To add the executive director of the Connecticut Council of Small Towns as a member of the Coordinating Advisory Board that was established to advise the Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection on matters concerning communication and cooperation in the provision of emergency response services.
Title
An Act Concerning The Membership Of The Coordinating Advisory Board To The Department Of Emergency Services And Public Protection.
Sponsors
Rep. David Aldarondo [D] | Sen. Joseph Crisco [D] | Sen. Edwin Gomes [D] | Rep. Frank Nicastro [D] |
House Public Safety and Security Committee | Sen. Gayle Slossberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 112 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 112 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 112 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-04-26 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-04-25 | Public Act 12-9 | |
2012-04-19 | In Concurrence | |
2012-04-19 | House Passed | |
2012-04-12 | House Calendar Number 325 | |
2012-04-12 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-11 | On Consent Calendar | |
2012-04-11 | Senate Passed | |
2012-03-19 | File Number 34 | |
2012-03-19 | Senate Calendar Number 75 | |
2012-03-19 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-03-19 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-12 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/12 10:00 AM | |
2012-03-02 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-01 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-02-24 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |
2012-02-22 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |