CT SB00194 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the Department of Social Services to enter into contracts with other states.
Title
An Act Authorizing The Department Of Social Services To Contract With Other States.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 359 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 258 AS AMENDED (Y: 133 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 258 AS AMENDED (Y: 133 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-17 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-17 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-16 | House | Public Act 22-137 |
2022-05-04 | House | In Concurrence |
2022-05-04 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-04 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-04 | House | House Calendar Number 564 |
2022-05-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-05-04 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6534 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | File Number 138 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 125 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |