CT SB00193 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-16 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-16 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To expand the category of persons who are mandated reporters and to require criminal history records check for youth camp staff employees and volunteers.
Title
An Act Concerning Mandated Reporters And Requiring Criminal History Records Checks For Youth Camp Directors And Alternate Directors.
Sponsors
Rep. Juan Candelaria [D] | Rep. Kimberly Fawcett [D] | Rep. Mary Fritz [D] | Rep. Minnie Gonzalez [D] |
Rep. Kim Rose [D] | House Select Committee on Children | Rep. Diana Urban [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-16 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services | |
2012-03-16 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services | |
2012-03-16 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-14 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-13 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Human Services | |
2012-02-23 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |
2012-02-22 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |