CT SB00192 | 2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-15 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To protect consumers who play daily fantasy sports contests from unfair or deceptive acts or practices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Daily Fantasy Sports.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-15SenateFavorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2016-03-15SenateFavorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2016-03-15SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2016-03-11SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2016-03-11SenateJoint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2016-02-26SenatePublic Hearing 03/03
2016-02-18SenateReferred to Joint Committee on General Law

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback