CT SB00192 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-01 - House Calendar Number 484
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-01 - House Calendar Number 484
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To allow an insured or certificate holder to designate a participating, in-network physician or advanced practice registered nurse as such insured's or certificate holder's primary care provider.
Title
An Act Concerning The Listing Of Advanced Practice Registered Nurses In Managed Care Organization Provider Listings, And Primary Care Provider Designations.
Sponsors
Rep. Theresa Conroy [D] | Rep. Maryanne Hornish [D] | House Insurance and Real Estate Committee | Rep. Linda Schofield [D] |
Rep. Roberta Willis [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 273 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-01 | House Calendar Number 484 | |
2010-05-01 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-05-01 | Immediate Transmittal to the House | |
2010-05-01 | On Consent Calendar | |
2010-05-01 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-05-01 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4839 | |
2010-04-21 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-21 | No New File by Committee on Public Health | |
2010-04-20 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-20 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-20 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-04-14 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health | |
2010-04-06 | File Number 291 | |
2010-04-06 | Senate Calendar Number 214 | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-06 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-29 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/10 10:00 AM | |
2010-03-18 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-18 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-02-19 | Public Hearing 02/25 | |
2010-02-17 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |