CT SB00186 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-19 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-19 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To: (1) Enable care-giving institutions to institute, and certain pharmacists to operate under, collaborative drug therapy management policies; (2) provide that prescribing practitioners and pharmacists may enter into collaborative drug therapy management agreements and operate under collaborative drug therapy management policies; (3) provide that collaborative drug therapy management agreements and policies may apply to patient populations; (4) require that written protocols and collaborative drug therapy care plans (A) be specific to the patient, patients or patient populations involved, (B) contain detailed direction concerning the actions pharmacists may perform for the patient population involved, (C) include the therapeutic class of drug or classes of drugs, or medical devices, to be managed by pharmacists, and (D) contain a definition of the patient population involved; (5) eliminate a reporting requirement concerning encounters within the scope of collaborative drug therapy management agreements; (6) impose a reporting requirement concerning changes made to drug therapies within the scope of collaborative drug therapy management agreements and policies; and (7) require the Commissioner of Consumer Protection to adopt regulations concerning collaborative drug therapy management policies.
Title
An Act Concerning Collaborative Drug Therapy Management Agreements And Policies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-18 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-19 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-30 | Senate | File Number 213 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 169 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |