CT SB00186 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To permit persons sixteen years of age or older to operate rides at amusement parks, with certain requirements.
Title
An Act Allowing Persons Sixteen Years Of Age Or Older To Operate Rides At Amusement Parks.
Sponsors
House General Law Committee | Sen. Eric Berthel [R] | Rep. Anthony D'Amelio [R] | Rep. David Rutigliano [R] |
Sen. Kevin Witkos [R] | Rep. Christine Pavalock-D'Amato [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 269 (Y: 103 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Public Act 21-38 |
2021-06-02 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-06-02 | Senate | House Passed |
2021-04-29 | Senate | House Calendar Number 433 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-28 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2021-04-07 | Senate | File Number 314 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 204 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |