CT SB00181 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Calendar Number 386
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Calendar Number 386
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Public Health to report data regarding emergency department crowding.
Title
An Act Concerning Emergency Department Crowding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 83 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | House Calendar Number 386 |
2024-04-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4010 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | File Number 19 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 44 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/12/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |