CT SB00179 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-22 - House Calendar Number 442
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-22 - House Calendar Number 442
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To increase the minimum balance amount for which a consumer using a gift card may request a cash refund.
Title
An Act Concerning Cash Refunds For Gift Card Balances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 146 (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-22 | Senate | House Calendar Number 442 |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2022-03-21 | Senate | File Number 51 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 74 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |