CT SB00178 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To help protect senior citizens from sexual offenders.
Title
An Act Concerning Senior Safety Zones.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 302 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 260 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 260 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Special Act 14-20 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2014-05-07 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-02 | Senate | House Calendar Number 495 |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-05-01 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4123 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-16 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-03-27 | Senate | File Number 168 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 132 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |