CT SB00176 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-2-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-2-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To: (1) Modify existing energy caps involving shared clean energy facilities, (2) permit electric distribution companies to own solar power generation facilities within the Shared Clean Energy Facility program, and (3) to allow commercial and industrial customers in the non-residential renewable energy tariff program to use their entire roof space for generation.
Title
An Act Concerning Clean Energy Tariff Programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 130 AS AMENDED (Y: 129 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 186 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 186 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Public Act 22-14 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2022-04-28 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B |
2022-04-28 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B |
2022-04-28 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-04-27 | Senate | House Calendar Number 488 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 5483 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5481 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | File Number 348 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 246 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |