CT SB00176 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To add a reporting requirement for certain gifts to the state received by public officials or state employees.
Title
An Act Requiring The Reporting Of Certain Gifts To The State Under The Code Of Ethics For Public Officials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 331 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 305 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 305 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-22 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-22 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-18 | House | Public Act 18-64 |
2018-05-09 | House | In Concurrence |
2018-05-09 | House | House Passed |
2018-05-09 | House | Rules Suspended |
2018-05-09 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2018-03-20 | Senate | File Number 24 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 55 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |