CT SB00176 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To allow Qualified Medicare Beneficiaries to purchase Medicare Supplement Policies if permissible under federal law.
Title
An Act Concerning The Purchase Of Medicare Supplement Policies By Qualified Medicare Beneficiaries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 291 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 243 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 243 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Public Act 14-105 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2014-05-07 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Passed |
2014-05-01 | Senate | House Calendar Number 484 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-30 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-09 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2014-03-24 | Senate | File Number 75 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 95 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/14 10:00 AM |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |