CT SB00176 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To obtain greater benefits for the state from the film production tax credit by creating a tax rebate program.
Title
An Act Concerning The Film Tax Credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 358 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-05-24 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2010-05-18 | Public Act 10-107 | |
2010-05-06 | In Concurrence | |
2010-05-05 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-05-05 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-05-05 | Rules Suspended | |
2010-05-05 | House Calendar Number 530 | |
2010-05-05 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-05-05 | Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules | |
2010-05-05 | On Consent Calendar | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-05-04 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-05-04 | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2010-05-04 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-05-04 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-05-04 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-05-01 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2010-05-01 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4661 | |
2010-03-29 | File Number 162 | |
2010-03-29 | Senate Calendar Number 118 | |
2010-03-29 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-03-29 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-22 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/10 10:00 AM | |
2010-03-19 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-18 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-02-18 | Public Hearing 02/25 | |
2010-02-17 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |