CT SB00162 | 2017 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-24 - Public Hearing 03/02
Pending: Joint Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To extend the foreclosure mediation program until December 31, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Extending The Foreclosure Mediation Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-31 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-24SenatePublic Hearing 03/02
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Banking
2017-02-08SenateDrafted by Committee
2017-01-31SenateVote to Draft
2017-01-18SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Banking

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback