CT SB00157 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To ensure adequate and safe state-assisted housing for the elderly and younger persons with disabilities.
Title
An Act Concerning Adequate And Safe Housing For The Elderly And Younger Persons With Disabilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-28 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Aging |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Aging |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-19 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-03-29 | Senate | File Number 261 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 197 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 10:00 AM |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |