CT SB00139 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To authorize the Commissioner of Energy and Environmental Protection to establish a trout stamp.
Title
An Act Concerning The Authority Of The Commissioner Of Energy And Environmental Protection To Establish A Trout Stamp And A Resident Game Bird Conservation Stamp And Amending Certain Hunting And Fishing Fees For Residents Less Than Eighteen Years Of Age.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 208 AS AMENDED (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 240 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 244 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 240 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 244 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Public Act 16-27 |
2016-04-30 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2016-04-30 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-30 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-30 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2016-04-30 | Senate | House Calendar Number 515 |
2016-04-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-28 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5299 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-19 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2016-03-31 | Senate | File Number 365 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 257 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/24 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |