CT SB00132 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-8-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Calendar Number 401
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Calendar Number 401
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To eliminate various provisions concerning dog racing in this state.
Title
An Act Concerning Dog Racing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 105 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | House Calendar Number 401 |
2024-04-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2024-03-21 | Senate | File Number 69 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 69 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/20 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |