CT SB00132 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-17 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-17 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide funding for the operating expenses of the Consortium of Connecticut Art Museums.
Title
An Act Concerning Funding For The Consortium Of Connecticut Art Museums.
Sponsors
House Commerce Committee | Sen. Theresa Gerratana [D] | Rep. Selim Noujaim [R] | Sen. Andrea Stillman [D] |
Sen. Joan Hartley [D] | Rep. Mike Demicco [D] | Rep. Elissa Wright [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-07 | Senate | File Number 372 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 248 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 10:00 AM |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |