CT SB00130 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-22 - House Calendar Number 386
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-22 - House Calendar Number 386
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To protect patients by requiring physicians and medical practices to post notice relating to missed appointment fees.
Title
An Act Concerning Cancelled Doctors' Appointments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 170 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-22 | House Calendar Number 386 | |
2010-04-22 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-21 | On Consent Calendar | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Passed | |
2010-04-14 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-14 | No New File by Committee on Public Health | |
2010-04-14 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-14 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-14 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-04-08 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health | |
2010-03-16 | File Number 42 | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Calendar Number 60 | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-03-16 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-09 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-03 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-02 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-02-11 | Public Hearing 02/16 | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |