CT SB00129 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-03 - Senate Recommitted to Public Health
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-03 - Senate Recommitted to Public Health
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require insurance coverage for abuse-deterrent opioid analgesics.
Title
An Act Requiring A Study Of Abuse-deterrent And Nonabuse-deterrent Opioid Analgesics.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Public Health |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-04 | Senate | File Number 429 |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 293 |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/16 10:00 AM |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Insurance and Real Estate |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/24 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |