CT SB00115 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide confidentiality for disclosures made by military personnel who are victims of sexual assault to military sexual assault advocates.
Title
An Act Concerning The Military Sexual Assault Prevention And Response Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-03-14 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-03-14 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-09 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-08 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Judiciary | |
2012-02-24 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |
2012-02-16 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |