CT SB00113 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-03 - Senate Recommitted to Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-03 - Senate Recommitted to Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To determine the state's need for additional Medicaid waivers and Medicaid state plan amendments.
Title
An Act Concerning Federal Medicaid Waivers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Human Services |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-05 | Senate | File Number 470 |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 317 |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |