CT SB00105 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To promote the well-being of vulnerable children via a social innovation enterprise grant.
Title
An Act Concerning Social Innovation Investment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-29 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-23 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2014-04-07 | Senate | File Number 370 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 263 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 10:00 AM |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/20 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |